TX SB1260 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to applicability to military service members of minimum age policies imposed by commercial lodging establishments.
Title
Relating to applicability to military service members of minimum age policies imposed by commercial lodging establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |