TX SB1261 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of a person to serve as the chief appraiser for an appraisal district.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of a person to serve as the chief appraiser for an appraisal district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |