TX SB1262 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of hotel occupancy tax revenue collected by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the allocation of hotel occupancy tax revenue collected by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-04 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1449 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |