TX SB1271 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of Keep Austin Weird specialty license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of Keep Austin Weird specialty license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback