TX SB1284 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a competitive grant program to fund promotion of early literacy programs in certain communities in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a competitive grant program to fund promotion of early literacy programs in certain communities in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2879 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback