TX SB1293 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain courts to employ attorneys as mental health public defenders and to the reimbursement of an attorney who represents an indigent proposed patient in certain mental health proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain courts to employ attorneys as mental health public defenders and to the reimbursement of an attorney who represents an indigent proposed patient in certain mental health proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-24HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2938 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback