TX SB1315 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to periodic zero-based budgeting for certain political subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to periodic zero-based budgeting for certain political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback