TX SB1319 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain taxes and to an annual report submitted to the comptroller concerning those taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain taxes and to an annual report submitted to the comptroller concerning those taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1554 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1554
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Raymond
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback