TX SB132 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to operation of the Texas leverage fund program administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Title
Relating to operation of the Texas leverage fund program administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1654 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1593 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1593 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1654 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1593 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Paddie |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Lambert |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB31 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks