TX SB1325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to occupational licensing of certain military service members, military veterans, and military spouses by state agencies and political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to occupational licensing of certain military service members, military veterans, and military spouses by state agencies and political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Political Subdivisions
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Political Subdivisions
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS