TX SB1326 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal release of extraterritorial jurisdiction and disannexation involving certain areas.
Title
Relating to municipal release of extraterritorial jurisdiction and disannexation involving certain areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3454 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar