TX SB1332 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarette vapor products; imposing taxes; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarette vapor products; imposing taxes; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4013 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Taxation--Sales
Tobacco Products
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Taxation--Sales
Tobacco Products
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1332 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01332I.htm |