TX SB1361 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public resale by means of a public auction using online bidding and sale of property purchased by a taxing unit at an ad valorem tax sale.
Title
Relating to the public resale by means of a public auction using online bidding and sale of property purchased by a taxing unit at an ad valorem tax sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1652 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1361 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01361I.htm |