TX SB139 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a notice of educational rights for certain student evaluations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a notice of educational rights for certain student evaluations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1542 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1542
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB142 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback