TX SB1390 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to suicide prevention in public school curriculum and certain educational programs concerning suicide prevention and substance abuse prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to suicide prevention in public school curriculum and certain educational programs concerning suicide prevention and substance abuse prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenatePassed
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenateAmended
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hall
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-01SenateFiled
2019-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4193 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback