TX SB1393 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Returned to committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
City Government
City Government--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM