TX SB14 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-9)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Signed in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to broadband service or facilities provided by an electric cooperative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to broadband service or facilities provided by an electric cooperative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1362 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-14SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1362
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-13HouseAmended 1-Kuempel
2019-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateAmended
2019-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-02SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1446 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback