TX SB1420 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to recovery of the funds of an estate delivered to the comptroller.
Title
Relating to recovery of the funds of an estate delivered to the comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1361 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2064 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property