TX SB1426 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment by a county of public guardians for certain incapacitated persons and funding for guardianships by public guardians and related services.
Title
Relating to the establishment by a county of public guardians for certain incapacitated persons and funding for guardianships by public guardians and related services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Protection of Personal Information
SUPREME COURT
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Protection of Personal Information
SUPREME COURT