TX SB1428 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a property owner to bring suit to compel an appraisal district, chief appraiser, or appraisal review board to comply with a procedural requirement applicable to an ad valorem tax protest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a property owner to bring suit to compel an appraisal district, chief appraiser, or appraisal review board to comply with a procedural requirement applicable to an ad valorem tax protest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenatePassed
2019-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1745 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback