TX SB1429 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deadline for filing a request for binding arbitration of certain appraisal review board orders.
Title
Relating to the deadline for filing a request for binding arbitration of certain appraisal review board orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1802 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Subjects
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1429 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01429I.htm |