TX SB1444 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of rural hospitals to establish a health care collaborative.
Title
Relating to the authority of rural hospitals to establish a health care collaborative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3934 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1444 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01444I.htm |