TX SB1453 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of calculator applications in place of graphing calculators in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of calculator applications in place of graphing calculators in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-03HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenateAmended
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback