TX SB1458 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to compliance with federal coding guidelines for certain divisions and offices within the Health and Human Services Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to compliance with federal coding guidelines for certain divisions and offices within the Health and Human Services Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3573 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback