TX SB1492 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to grand jury proceedings and establishing a commission to study improvements and alternatives to those proceedings.
Title
Relating to grand jury proceedings and establishing a commission to study improvements and alternatives to those proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Juries
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Governor
GRAND JURIES, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
WITNESSES
Courts--Juries
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Governor
GRAND JURIES, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
WITNESSES