TX SB1494 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confidentiality of personal information of certain employees and contractors of the Department of Family and Protective Services and of certain elected officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confidentiality of personal information of certain employees and contractors of the Department of Family and Protective Services and of certain elected officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1421 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Motion to suspend regular order fails (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1421
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15HouseAmended 2-Wu
2019-05-15HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-15HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Wu
2019-05-15HouseAmended 1-Wu
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-15HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB759 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback