TX SB152 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the criminal offense of homosexual conduct.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the criminal offense of homosexual conduct.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB980 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HOMOSEXUALITY
SEX EDUCATION
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HOMOSEXUALITY
SEX EDUCATION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB152 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00152I.htm |