TX SB1524 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.
Title
Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB448 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY SEATS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Child Restraint
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Child Restraint
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1524 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01524I.htm |