TX SB1529 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to merger agreements among certain hospitals; imposing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to merger agreements among certain hospitals; imposing fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3301 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback