TX SB1535 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a complaint made by a foster child or youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a complaint made by a foster child or youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback