TX SB155 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release on parole of certain inmates convicted of an offense committed when younger than 18 years of age; changing parole eligibility.
Title
Relating to the release on parole of certain inmates convicted of an offense committed when younger than 18 years of age; changing parole eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB155 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00155I.htm |