TX SB1553 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the process for establishing speed limits on roads near certain schools.
Title
Relating to the process for establishing speed limits on roads near certain schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SPEED LIMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SPEED LIMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road