TX SB1564 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to access to certain medication-assisted treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to access to certain medication-assisted treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1666 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1666
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmended 2-J.D. Johnson
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Sheffield
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-04HouseRead first time
2019-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback