TX SB1565 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the medical authorization required to release protected health information in a health care liability claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the medical authorization required to release protected health information in a health care liability claim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-13SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 3248
2019-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3248 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback