TX SB1569 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of public money and resources by employees of an independent school district to distribute a communication that advocates for or opposes a political measure, candidate, or party; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the use of public money and resources by employees of an independent school district to distribute a communication that advocates for or opposes a political measure, candidate, or party; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Fallon |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Postponed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |