TX SB1571 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to recovery audits of payments made by state agencies to vendors.
Title
Relating to recovery audits of payments made by state agencies to vendors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1402 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1402 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2082 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control