TX SB1576 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Industrial Workforce Apprenticeship Grant Program.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Industrial Workforce Apprenticeship Grant Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2784 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1576 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01576I.htm |