TX SB1585 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to issue permits for the discharge into water in this state of produced water, hydrostatic test water, and gas plant effluent resulting from certain oil and gas activities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to issue permits for the discharge into water in this state of produced water, hydrostatic test water, and gas plant effluent resulting from certain oil and gas activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2771 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General