TX SB1587 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the delegation to the Railroad Commission of Texas of purchasing functions regarding the reclamation of certain abandoned mines.
Title
Relating to the delegation to the Railroad Commission of Texas of purchasing functions regarding the reclamation of certain abandoned mines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#546 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#546 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2270 |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2270 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Environment
Environment--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Environment--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
RAILROAD COMMISSION