TX SB1591 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited balance billing and an independent dispute resolution program for out-of-network coverage under certain managed care plans; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to prohibited balance billing and an independent dispute resolution program for out-of-network coverage under certain managed care plans; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2967 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1591 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01591I.htm |