TX SB16 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain full-time peace officers in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain full-time peace officers in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1454 (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1454
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-17HouseRead first time
2019-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-11SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB14 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback