TX SB1600 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the resignation or termination or nonrenewal of the contract of a superintendent of a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the resignation or termination or nonrenewal of the contract of a superintendent of a school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenatePassed
2019-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback