TX SB1613 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to turnout requirements for certain elections authorizing the issuance of bonds or an increase in taxes by a political subdivision.
Title
Relating to turnout requirements for certain elections authorizing the issuance of bonds or an increase in taxes by a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |