TX SB1648 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to payment card skimmers on motor fuel dispensers; imposing a civil penalty; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to payment card skimmers on motor fuel dispensers; imposing a civil penalty; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Consumer Protection
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
Financial
Financial--General
FRAUD
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Consumer Protection
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
Financial
Financial--General
FRAUD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1648 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01648I.htm |