TX SB1649 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of funding for indigent defense services and to the representation of indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to the provision of funding for indigent defense services and to the representation of indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY'S FEES
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--General
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Criminal Procedure--General
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES