TX SB1659 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the management of the permanent school fund by the School Land Board and the State Board of Education and a study regarding distributions from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Title
Relating to the management of the permanent school fund by the School Land Board and the State Board of Education and a study regarding distributions from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] |
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Watson |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Watson |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3467 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SCHOOL LAND BOARD
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SCHOOL LAND BOARD