TX SB1664 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and operation of the state's programs for paying, prepaying, or saving toward the costs of attending an institution of higher education, including the powers and duties of the Prepaid Higher Education Tuition Board.
Title
Relating to the administration and operation of the state's programs for paying, prepaying, or saving toward the costs of attending an institution of higher education, including the powers and duties of the Prepaid Higher Education Tuition Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3655 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
PREPAID HIGHER EDUCATION TUITION BOARD
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
PREPAID HIGHER EDUCATION TUITION BOARD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1664 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01664I.htm |