TX SB1682 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing a contingency reserve account under the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program.
Title
Relating to establishing a contingency reserve account under the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1449 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers