TX SB1689 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and use of public facilities corporations.
Title
Relating to the creation and use of public facilities corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4317 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
Subjects
Corporations & Associations
Financial
Financial--General
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Financial
Financial--General
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local