TX SB1692 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2458 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1692 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01692I.htm |